+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed