+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/17/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed