+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed