+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/26/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On December 28, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor