+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/9/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On December 22, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor