+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transparency in State Agency Operations, Select
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed