+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/17
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed