+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor