+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Filed