+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Recommitted to committee
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor