+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor