+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 3rd time
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/6/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor