+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to suspend regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Motion withdrawn
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed