+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/29/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/14/2019
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor