+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Filed