+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On January 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor