+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/10/2019
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/26/2019
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor