+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (16)
Davis, John
Type:
Primary Sponsor