+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed