+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/15/2019
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor