+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
- Read first time
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Filed