+ − Actions (34)
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Filed