+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/25/2019
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor