+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Filed