+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor