+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
- Considered in public hearing
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/13/2019
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed