+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor