+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/17/2019
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor