+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/19
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Transportation
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/26/2019
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor