+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
- Read first time
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed