+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (76)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 1/1/14
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amended
- Amended
- Record vote
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Point of order withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment as amended tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment tabled
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Manufacturing by chair
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor