+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor