+ − Actions (18)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Filed