+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (67)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment withdrawn
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Corrected comm. report distributed
- Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
- Read first time
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed