+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (101)
Type:
Primary Sponsor