+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/17/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor