+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/19
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/13/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to State Affairs
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/18/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor