+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (78)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
- House discharges conferees-reported
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- House discharges conferees
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/20/2021
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Rereferred to committee
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/30/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor