+ − Actions (27)
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor