+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor