+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (69)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House for further action
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate for further action
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor