+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/7/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor