+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/15/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor