+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/19/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor