+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/17/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor