+ − Actions (74)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the House:
- Filed