+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Filed