+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On December 21, 2016 in the House:
- Filed