+ − Actions (28)
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Failed to pass
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Point of order overruled
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor