+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (80)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Corrected Conference committee report filed
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/8/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/18/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
- Read first time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Filed